IA SF620 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 18 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-18 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 863.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the procedure for disposal of certain city utilities by sale. (Formerly SSB 1184.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the procedure for disposal of certain city utilities by sale. (Formerly SSB 1184.) Effective date: 07/01/2020.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-11 - House - Passed House (Y: 68 N: 29 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-18SenateSigned by Governor. S.J. 863.
2020-06-16SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 862.
2020-06-11SenateMessage from House. S.J. 777.
2020-06-11HouseImmediate message. H.J. 700.
2020-06-11HousePassed House, yeas 68, nays 29. H.J. 698.
2020-06-09HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 671.
2020-02-24HouseSubcommittee Meeting: 02/25/2020 11:30AM House Lounge.
2020-02-13HouseSubcommittee: Wheeler, Carlson and Jacoby. H.J. 274.
2019-04-23HouseRead first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 950.
2019-04-23HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 949.
2019-04-23SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1054.
2019-04-23SenatePassed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1053.
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 947.
2019-04-15SenateIntroduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 945.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1184 (Related) 2019-04-02 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback