IA SF616 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 17 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-17 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly SSB 1254.) Effective 7-1-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to appropriations to the judicial branch. (Formerly SSB 1254.) Effective 7-1-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-24 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 72 N: 27 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-17HouseSigned by Governor.
2019-05-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-24HouseNOBA: Final
2019-04-24HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 998.
2019-04-24SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1096.
2019-04-24SenatePassed Senate, yeas 35, nays 15. S.J. 1095.
2019-04-24SenateSenate concurred with S-3216. S.J. 1095.
2019-04-24SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3216. S.J. 1079.
2019-04-23HouseImmediate message. H.J. 979.
2019-04-24HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1012.
2019-04-23HouseNOBA: House Floor
2019-04-23HousePassed House, yeas 72 nays 27. H.J. 977.
2019-04-23HouseCommittee amendment H-1254 out of order. H.J. 977.
2019-04-23HouseAmendment H-1270 adopted. H.J. 977.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1270 filed. H.J. 947.
2019-04-19HouseNOBA: House Full Approps
2019-04-18HouseCommittee amendment H-1254 filed. H.J. 926.
2019-04-18HouseCommittee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 925.
2019-04-17HouseNOBA: House Sub
2019-04-17HouseSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2019-04-17HouseSubcommittee: Worthan, Anderson, Bossman, Hite, Holt, James, Kacena, Sexton and Sunde. H.J. 900.
2019-04-16HouseRead first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 861.
2019-04-15HouseNOBA: Senate Floor
2019-04-15HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 848.
2019-04-15SenateImmediate message. S.J. 953.
2019-04-15SenatePassed Senate, yeas 35, nays 15. S.J. 951.
2019-04-08SenateNOBA: Senate Full Approps
2019-04-08SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 890.
2019-04-08SenateIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 889.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1254 (Related) 2019-04-04 - NOBA: Senate Sub

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback