IA SF589 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal law and procedure including certain related administrative proceedings, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 405.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal law and procedure including certain related administrative proceedings, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 405.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-25 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - House - Passed House (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196. |
2019-05-03 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-25 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1037. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1130. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 49, nays 0. S.J. 1125. |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3212. S.J. 1125. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Fiscal note, as amended and passed by the House. |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3212. S.J. 1079. |
2019-04-23 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 979. |
2019-04-23 | House | Passed House, yeas 98 nays none. H.J. 955. |
2019-04-23 | House | Amendment H-1269 adopted. H.J. 954. |
2019-04-23 | House | Substituted for HF 729. H.J. 954. |
2019-04-22 | House | Amendment H-1269 filed. H.J. 947. |
2019-04-09 | House | Fiscal note, as passed by the Senate. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 711. |
2019-04-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 705. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 812. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17. S.J. 810. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3102 filed, ruled out of order. S.J. 809. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Point of order raised on S-3095, ruled out of order. S.J. 809. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3104 filed, lost. S.J. 808. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Amendment S-3093 adopted. S.J. 808. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3095 filed. S.J. 797. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 791. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Amendment S-3093 filed. S.J. 791. |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 549. |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 545. |
Same As/Similar To
SF405 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 549.
HSB237 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 468.
HF729 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
HSB237 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 468.
HF729 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.