IA SF405 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 549.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to criminal law and procedure including certain related administrative proceedings, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 589.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to criminal law and procedure including certain related administrative proceedings, providing penalties, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 589.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-11 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 589. S.J. 549. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Zaun. S.J. 419. |
2019-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 417. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB237 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 468.
SF589 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
HF729 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
SF589 (Similar To) 2019-05-16 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
HF729 (Similar To) 2019-04-23 - Withdrawn. H.J. 980.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF405 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF405.html |