IA SF579 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-02-11 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to nonresident alien public offense data collection and analysis. (Formerly SF 406.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to nonresident alien public offense data collection and analysis. (Formerly SF 406.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-11SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-02-06SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 02/11/2020 2:00PM RM 22.
2020-01-15SenateSubcommittee: Whiting, Bisignano, and Dawson. S.J. 87.
2019-04-27SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 1191.
2019-04-04SenatePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 857.
2019-03-11SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 527.
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 520.

Same As/Similar To

SF406 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 579. S.J. 527.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback