IA SF571 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-03-11 - Subcommittee: Kaufmann, Bergan and Oldson. H.J. 588.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care. (Formerly SF 11.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care. (Formerly SF 11.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-10 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-11HouseSubcommittee: Kaufmann, Bergan and Oldson. H.J. 588.
2020-03-11HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 572.
2020-03-10HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 565.
2020-03-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 562.
2020-03-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 561.
2020-03-10SenateAmendment S-5070 filed, adopted. S.J. 561.
2020-02-24SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 399.
2020-01-29SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2020-01-23SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/28/2020 4:00PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge.
2020-01-22SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Schultz. S.J. 128.
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 859.
2019-03-11SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 526.
2019-03-11SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 519.

Same As/Similar To

SF11 (Similar To) 2019-03-11 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 571. S.J. 526.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback