IA SF11 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Reported out of committee as SF 571. S.J. 526.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care. (See SF 571.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the awarding of joint custody and joint physical care. (See SF 571.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11SenateReported out of committee as SF 571. S.J. 526.
2019-01-16SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Hogg, and Schultz. S.J. 110.
2019-01-15SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 81.

Same As/Similar To

SF571 (Similar To) 2019-04-04 - Referred to Judiciary. S.J. 859.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback