IA SF566 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 977.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-26 - Withdrawn. S.J. 977.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to money transmission services.(Formerly SF 421, SSB 1102.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to money transmission services.(Formerly SF 421, SSB 1102.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-26 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 977. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | HF 675 substituted. S.J. 976. |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Attached to HF 675. S.J. 772. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 748. |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 747. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1102 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 421.
HSB128 (Related) 2023-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 431.
HF431 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
SF421 (Similar To) 2023-04-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 566. S.J. 748.
HF675 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1043.
HSB128 (Related) 2023-02-24 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 431.
HF431 (Similar To) 2023-04-11 - Withdrawn. H.J. 805.
SF421 (Similar To) 2023-04-06 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 566. S.J. 748.
HF675 (Similar To) 2023-05-11 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 1043.