IA SF566 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 586. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 586. S.J. 684.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to banks, making appropriations, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 1236; See SF 586.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to banks, making appropriations, providing penalties, and making penalties applicable.(Formerly SSB 1236; See SF 586.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-08 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 0 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 586. S.J. 684. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 03/17/2021 12:30PM 217 Conference Room. |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Williams, Klimesh, and Petersen. S.J. 569. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 532. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 552. |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 550. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1236 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 566.
SF586 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 842.
SF586 (Similar To) 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 842.