IA SF586 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-12 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 842.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to banks, making appropriations, and making civil penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 566, SSB 1236.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Title
A bill for an act relating to banks, making appropriations, and making civil penalties applicable. (Formerly SF 566, SSB 1236.) Effective date: 07/01/2022.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2021-04-13 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 842. |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 842. |
2022-04-05 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 780. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 710. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 706. |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-5104. S.J. 705. |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-5104. S.J. 647. |
2022-03-29 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 730. |
2022-03-29 | House | Passed House, yeas 96, nays 0. H.J. 711. |
2022-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8270 adopted. H.J. 711. |
2022-03-29 | House | Amendment H-8001 adopted. H.J. 710. |
2022-03-28 | House | Amendment H-8270 filed. H.J. 706. |
2022-03-01 | House | Placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 440. |
2022-03-01 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 440. |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-02-22 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2022 4:30PM House Lounge. |
2022-02-21 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/22/2022 5:00PM House Lounge. |
2022-02-01 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Deyoe and Hall. H.J. 160. |
2022-01-25 | House | Pursuant to Rule 31.7, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 120. |
2022-01-25 | House | Committee amendment H-8001 filed H.J. 121. |
2022-01-24 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 120. |
2022-01-24 | House | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2022-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2022 12:00PM House Lounge 2. |
2022-01-11 | House | Subcommittee: Mohr, G., Bousselot and Nielsen. H.J. 50. |
2021-04-21 | House | Read first time, referred to Commerce. H.J. 985. |
2021-04-13 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 941. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 865. |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 45, nays 0. S.J. 864. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 684. |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 683. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1236 (Related) 2021-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 566.
SF566 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 586. S.J. 684.
SF566 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 586. S.J. 684.