IA SF56 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 727.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-25 - Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 727.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for the registration of eligible electors upon review of electronic records received from state agencies and including effective date provisions.
Title
A bill for an act providing for the registration of eligible electors upon review of electronic records received from state agencies and including effective date provisions.
Sponsors
Sen. Pam Jochum [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Giddens. S.J. 727. |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Lykam. S.J. 342. |
2019-01-22 | Senate | Subcommittee: R. Smith, Cournoyer, and Danielson. S.J. 146. |
2019-01-16 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 107. |
Same As/Similar To
HF72 (Similar To) 2019-01-23 - Introduced, referred to State Government. H.J. 134.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF56 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF56.html |