IA SF557 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on June 1 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-01 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and Iowa utilities board, creating a licensing and regulation fund, and modifying provisions related to major procurement contracts for the Iowa lottery division of the department of revenue. (Formerly SSB 1209.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for state government administration and regulation, including the department of administrative services, auditor of state, ethics and campaign disclosure board, offices of governor and lieutenant governor, department of inspections, appeals, and licensing, department of insurance and financial services, department of management, Iowa public employees' retirement system, public information board, department of revenue, secretary of state, treasurer of state, and Iowa utilities board, creating a licensing and regulation fund, and modifying provisions related to major procurement contracts for the Iowa lottery division of the department of revenue. (Formerly SSB 1209.) Effective date: 07/01/2023.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - House - Shall amendment H–1326 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall amendment H–1326 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 60 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - House - Shall amendment H–1326 be adopted? (Y: 34 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-26 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall amendment S–3183 be adopted? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Appropriations Report (Y: 13 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1087. |
2023-05-24 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2023-05-16 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1086. |
2023-05-03 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1034. |
2023-05-02 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 977. |
2023-05-03 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1014. |
2023-05-02 | House | Passed House, yeas 60, nays 35. H.J. 966. |
2023-05-02 | House | Amendment H-1326, yeas 34, nays 61, lost. H.J. 965. |
2023-05-02 | House | Unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 957. |
2023-04-27 | House | NOBA: House Sub |
2023-05-01 | House | Amendment H-1326 filed. H.J. 954. |
2023-04-27 | House | NOBA: House Full Approps |
2023-04-27 | House | Placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 917. |
2023-04-27 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 917. |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. []. |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee: Bergan, Amos Jr. and Young. H.J. 917. |
2023-04-27 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: []. |
2023-04-27 | House | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 916. |
2023-04-27 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 916. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 976. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 975. |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Amendment S-3183 adopted. S.J. 975. |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Amendment S-3183 filed. S.J. 963. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 735. |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 733. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1209 (Related) 2023-04-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 557.