IA SF556 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Schultz. S.J. 61.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-01-09 - Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Schultz. S.J. 61.
Pending: Senate Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act providing for financing of certain agricultural commodity programs, by reducing and eliminating fees imposed on licensed grain dealers and warehouse operators, replacing those moneys with moneys collected from a percentage of state assessments imposed on the sale of corn, increasing moneys deposited into the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, increasing indemnification amounts, and making appropriations.(Formerly SSB 1205.)
Title
A bill for an act providing for financing of certain agricultural commodity programs, by reducing and eliminating fees imposed on licensed grain dealers and warehouse operators, replacing those moneys with moneys collected from a percentage of state assessments imposed on the sale of corn, increasing moneys deposited into the grain depositors and sellers indemnity fund, increasing indemnification amounts, and making appropriations.(Formerly SSB 1205.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
Senate - Senate Ways And Means Report (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-09 | Senate | Subcommittee: Driscoll, Jochum, and Schultz. S.J. 61. |
2023-12-31 | Senate | END OF [] ACTIONS |
2023-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Ways and Means. S.J. 1092. |
2023-04-05 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 723. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 700. |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 696. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1205 (Related) 2023-03-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 556.