IA SF542 | 2011-2012 | 84th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 22 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-12-31 - END OF 2011 ACTIONS
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for health and human services and including other related provisions, providing penalties, and including effective, retroactive, and applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1218.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to and making appropriations for health and human services and including other related provisions, providing penalties, and including effective, retroactive, and applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1218.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-31 | END OF 2011 ACTIONS | |
2011-06-22 | Read first time, referred to Appropriations. H.J. 1259. | |
2011-06-22 | Message from Senate. H.J. 1258. | |
2011-06-22 | Immediate message. S.J. 1186. | |
2011-06-22 | Passed Senate, ayes 26, nays 23. S.J. 1183. | |
2011-06-22 | Amendment S-3360 adopted. S.J. 1183. | |
2011-06-22 | Amendment S-3361 filed, adopted. S.J. 1182. | |
2011-06-21 | Amendment S-3360 filed. S.J. 1180. | |
2011-06-20 | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1164. | |
2011-06-20 | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1160. |