IA SF531 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to pediatric congenital heart surgery including data reporting and the provision of patient education by hospitals. (Formerly SF 387.) Effective 7-1-19.
Title
A bill for an act relating to pediatric congenital heart surgery including data reporting and the provision of patient education by hospitals. (Formerly SF 387.) Effective 7-1-19.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196. |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor. S.J. 1193. |
2019-04-19 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1025. |
2019-04-18 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 922. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1013. |
2019-04-18 | House | Passed House, yeas 95 nays none. H.J. 909. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-03 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 738. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/02/2019 8:00AM House Lounge. |
2019-04-01 | House | Subcommittee: A. Meyer, Best and Sunde. H.J. 707. |
2019-03-25 | House | Read first time, referred to Human Resources. H.J. 621. |
2019-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 617. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 705. |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 46, nays 0. S.J. 704. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 507. |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 499. |
Same As/Similar To
HF430 (Similar To) 2019-04-18 - Withdrawn. H.J. 922.
SF387 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 531. S.J. 507.
SF387 (Similar To) 2019-03-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 531. S.J. 507.