IA SF515 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 18 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 1112.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1199.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 1112. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | HF 653 substituted. S.J. 1105. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3366 filed, adopted. S.J. 1105. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 653. S.J. 1094. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 1060. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 1058. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB206 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1076.
HF653 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - NOBA: Graybook
SSB1199 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.
HF653 (Similar To) 2017-05-15 - NOBA: Graybook
SSB1199 (Related) 2017-04-18 - Subcommittee: Subcommittee of the Whole.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF515 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF515.html |