IA HF653 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 12 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-12 - Item vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1155.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly HSB 206.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates, see bill.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to appropriations for health and human services and veterans and including other related provisions and appropriations, providing penalties, and including effective date and retroactive and other applicability date provisions. (Formerly HSB 206.) Item vetoed. Various effective dates, see bill.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-19 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 55 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-12HouseItem vetoed, signed by Governor H.J. 1155.
2017-05-03HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 1147.
2017-05-03HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 1147.
2017-04-20HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-20SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1112.
2017-04-20SenatePassed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 1110.
2017-04-20SenatePoint of order raised on S-3385, ruled out of order. S.J. 1110.
2017-04-20SenatePoint of order raised on S-3384, ruled out of order. S.J. 1109.
2017-04-20SenateAmendments S-3384 and S-3385 filed. S.J. 1109.
2017-04-20SenateAmendment S-3383 filed, withdrawn. S.J. 1107.
2017-04-20SenatePoint of order raised on S-3379, ruled out of order. S.J. 1107.
2017-04-20SenateAmendment S-3379 filed. S.J. 1107.
2017-04-20SenatePoint of order raised on S-3371, ruled out of order. S.J. 1106.
2017-04-20SenateAmendment S-3371 filed. S.J. 1106.
2017-04-20SenateAmendment S-3370 filed, lost. S.J. 1106.
2017-04-20SenateSubstituted for SF 515. S.J. 1105.
2017-04-19SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 515. S.J. 1094.
2017-04-19SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1094.
2017-04-19HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1094.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HousePassed House, ayes 55, nays 42. H.J. 1094.
2017-04-19HouseAmendments H-1400, H-1401 and H-1402 withdrawn. H.J. 1093.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1399 as amended adopted. H.J. 1093.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HouseMotion to suspend rules prevailed. H.J. 1093.
2017-04-19HouseMotion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1399 as amended. H.J. 1092.
2017-04-19HousePoint of order raised on H-1399 as amended, ruled not germane. H.J. 1092.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1419 to amendment H-1399 adopted. H.J. 1092.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1419 to amendment H-1399 filed. H.J. 1091.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1408 to amendment H-1399 filed, lost. H.J. 1091.
2017-04-19HouseMotion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 1090.
2017-04-19HouseMotion to suspend rules for consideration of H-1407 to amendment H-1399. H.J. 1089.
2017-04-19HousePoint of order raised on H-1407 to amendment H-1399, ruled not germane. H.J. 1089.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1407 to amendment H-1399 filed. H.J. 1089.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1406 to amendment H-1399 adopted. H.J. 1089.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1406 to amendment H-1399 filed. H.J. 1088.
2017-04-20HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 1114.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1410 to amendment H-1399 lost. H.J. 1087.
2017-04-19HouseAmendment H-1410 to amendment H-1399 filed. H.J. 1087.
2017-04-19HouseAsked and received unanimous consent for immediate consideration. H.J. 1085.
2017-04-18HouseAmendments H-1399, H-1400, H-1401 and H-1402 filed. H.J. 1077.
2017-04-18HouseIntroduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. H.J. 1038.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback