IA SF507 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 7 2023 - 50% progression
Action: 2023-03-30 - Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act concerning public contracts with companies that boycott certain companies or that engage in nonpecuniary social investment policies.(Formerly SSB 1094.)
Title
A bill for an act concerning public contracts with companies that boycott certain companies or that engage in nonpecuniary social investment policies.(Formerly SSB 1094.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-15 - House - Shall the rules be suspended to consider amendment H–1090? (Y: 34 N: 63 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2023-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-15 - House - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 63 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-07 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-03-02 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3085. S.J. 594. |
2023-03-15 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 653. |
2023-03-15 | House | Passed House, yeas 63, nays 34. H.J. 642. |
2023-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1089 adopted, as amended. H.J. 641. |
2023-03-15 | House | Amendment H-1117 to amendment H-1089 filed, adopted. H.J. 641. |
2023-03-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules failed. H.J. 641. |
2023-03-15 | House | Motion to suspend rules for immediate consideration of amendment H-1090, yeas 34, nays 63. H.J. 640. |
2023-03-15 | House | Point of order raised on amendment H-1090, ruled not germane. H.J. 640. |
2023-03-15 | House | Substituted for HF 653. H.J. 640. |
2023-03-14 | House | Amendments H-1089 and H-1090 filed. H.J. 622. |
2023-03-09 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 564. |
2023-03-08 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 543. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 533. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 33, nays 16. S.J. 533. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 470. |
2023-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 462. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1094 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 507.
HSB180 (Related) 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1.
HSB180 (Related) 2023-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. Vote Total: 2-1.