IA SF497 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 1 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 534. S.J. 512.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to law enforcement and certain criminal offenses, and providing penalties.(See SF 534.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to law enforcement and certain criminal offenses, and providing penalties.(See SF 534.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-03SenateCommittee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 534. S.J. 512.
2021-03-02SenateSubcommittee recommends passage.
2021-03-01SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 03/02/2021 11:00AM RM 111.
2021-03-01SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Dawson, and Kinney. S.J. 484.
2021-03-01SenateIntroduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 482.

Same As/Similar To

SF534 (Similar To) 2021-03-25 - Amendment H-1306 filed. H.J. 855.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback