IA SF534 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 10 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Amendment H-1306 filed. H.J. 855.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to law enforcement and certain criminal offenses, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 497.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to law enforcement and certain criminal offenses, and providing penalties. (Formerly SF 497.)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-10 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3067 be adopted? (Y: 31 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Report (Y: 10 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-25HouseAmendment H-1306 filed. H.J. 855.
2021-03-12HouseRead first time, referred to Public Safety. H.J. 719.
2021-03-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 703.
2021-03-10SenateImmediate message. S.J. 589.
2021-03-10SenatePassed Senate, yeas 31, nays 17. S.J. 588.
2021-03-10SenateAmendment S-3067 filed, lost. S.J. 588.
2021-03-10SenateAmendment S-3063 adopted. S.J. 587.
2021-03-10SenatePoint of order raised on S-3068, ruled not germane. S.J. 587.
2021-03-10SenateAmendment S-3068 filed. S.J. 587.
2021-03-10SenateAmendment S-3063 filed. S.J. 587.
2021-03-10SenateDeferred. S.J. 578.
2021-03-10SenateFiscal note.
2021-03-03SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 512.
2021-03-03SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 507.

Same As/Similar To

SF497 (Similar To) 2021-03-03 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 534. S.J. 512.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback