IA SF488 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the workforce housing tax incentives program by requiring allocations to certain housing projects and by increasing the allowable average dwelling unit cost and the percentage of investment for tax incentives for certain housing projects. (Formerly SSB 1035.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the workforce housing tax incentives program by requiring allocations to certain housing projects and by increasing the allowable average dwelling unit cost and the percentage of investment for tax incentives for certain housing projects. (Formerly SSB 1035.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-21 - House - Passed House (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Senate | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-21 | Senate | Message from House. S.J. 1119. |
2017-04-21 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 1125. |
2017-04-21 | House | Passed House, ayes 95, nays 1. H.J. 1122. |
2017-04-20 | House | Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 1116. |
2017-04-19 | House | Read first time, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 1078. |
2017-04-18 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1056. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1050. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 1047. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3335 out of order. S.J. 1047. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3340 adopted. S.J. 1047. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendment S-3334 withdrawn. S.J. 1047. |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Amendments S-3334, S-3335, and S-3340 filed. S.J. 1047. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 560. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Ways and Means calendar. S.J. 558. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB65 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 431.
SSB1035 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF439 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1125.
SSB1035 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF439 (Similar To) 2017-04-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1125.