IA HF439 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-04-21 - Withdrawn. H.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the workforce housing tax incentives program by increasing the maximum dollar amount that may be allocated to the program, by requiring allocation to certain housing projects, and by increasing the percentage of investment for tax incentives for certain housing projects. (Formerly HSB 65.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the workforce housing tax incentives program by increasing the maximum dollar amount that may be allocated to the program, by requiring allocation to certain housing projects, and by increasing the percentage of investment for tax incentives for certain housing projects. (Formerly HSB 65.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Withdrawn. H.J. 1125. |
2017-02-27 | House | Introduced, referred to Ways and Means. H.J. 466. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB65 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 431.
SSB1035 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF488 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
SSB1035 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
SF488 (Similar To) 2017-05-11 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HF439 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/HouseFiles/Introduced/HF439.html |