IA SF483 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Subcommittee: Sexton, Hunter and Zumbach. H.J. 757.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-22 - Subcommittee: Sexton, Hunter and Zumbach. H.J. 757.
Pending: House State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring that a primary runoff election be held in the event of an inconclusive primary election for certain offices, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 33.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring that a primary runoff election be held in the event of an inconclusive primary election for certain offices, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (Formerly SF 33.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Subcommittee: Sexton, Hunter and Zumbach. H.J. 757. |
2017-03-15 | House | Read first time, referred to State Government. H.J. 656. |
2017-03-15 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 654. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 618. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 618. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 514. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 507. |
Same As/Similar To
SF33 (Similar To) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.