IA SF33 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring that a primary runoff election be held in the event of an inconclusive primary election for certain offices, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 483.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring that a primary runoff election be held in the event of an inconclusive primary election for certain offices, and including effective date and applicability provisions. (See SF 483.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee reassigned: Smith, Brown, and Jochum. S.J. 272. |
2017-01-19 | Senate | Subcommittee: Smith, Chapman, and Jochum. S.J. 106. |
2017-01-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to State Government. S.J. 59. |
Same As/Similar To
SF483 (Similar To) 2017-03-22 - Subcommittee: Sexton, Hunter and Zumbach. H.J. 757.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF33 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF33.html |