IA SF480 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 693.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 693.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to exemptions from disciplinary action for persons licensed to practice health-related professions based on their treatment of Lyme disease or other tick-borne diseases, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 222.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to exemptions from disciplinary action for persons licensed to practice health-related professions based on their treatment of Lyme disease or other tick-borne diseases, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SF 222.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 693. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | HF 577 substituted. S.J. 689. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Amendment S-3151 withdrawn. S.J. 689. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Amendment S-3151 filed. S.J. 607. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Attached to companion HF 577. S.J. 594. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Deferred. S.J. 588. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 511. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 506. |
Same As/Similar To
SF222 (Similar To) 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF480 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF480.html |