IA SF222 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-03-01 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to alternative or complementary medicine, including exemptions from disciplinary action for persons licensed to practice health-related professions and a limitation on available damages in a civil action, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 480.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to alternative or complementary medicine, including exemptions from disciplinary action for persons licensed to practice health-related professions and a limitation on available damages in a civil action, and including effective date provisions. (See SF 480.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-01SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2017-02-15SenateSubcommittee: Garrett, Mathis, and Shipley. S.J. 301.
2017-02-09SenateIntroduced, referred to Human Resources. S.J. 252.

Same As/Similar To

SF480 (Similar To) 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 693.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback