IA SF473 | 2015-2016 | 86th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Kraayenbrink, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 257.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-02-17 - Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Kraayenbrink, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 257.
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the state preschool program for four-year-old children by establishing a preschool expansion incentive, authorizing state aid for the incentive, and addressing program costs. (Formerly SSB 1101 and SF 246.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the state preschool program for four-year-old children by establishing a preschool expansion incentive, authorizing state aid for the incentive, and addressing program costs. (Formerly SSB 1101 and SF 246.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-17 | Senate | Subcommittee, Dvorsky, Kraayenbrink, and Schoenjahn. S.J. 257. |
2015-06-05 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations. S.J. 1122. |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Fiscal note. SCS. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 569. |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Introduced, placed on Appropriations calendar. S.J. 568. |
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=86&ba=SF473 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/86thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF473.html |