IA SF465 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to medical malpractice claims, including noneconomic damage awards and expert witnesses, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1087.) Effective 7-1-17.
Title
A bill for an act relating to medical malpractice claims, including noneconomic damage awards and expert witnesses, and including applicability provisions. (Formerly SSB 1087.) Effective 7-1-17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-12 - House - Passed House (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-20 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 28 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 37 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-05 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136. |
2017-04-25 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-25 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134. |
2017-04-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 1024. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 1029. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 37, nays 12. S.J. 1028. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3316. S.J. 1027. |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3316. S.J. 996. |
2017-04-12 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 996. |
2017-04-12 | House | Passed House, ayes 65, nays 32. H.J. 995. |
2017-04-12 | House | Amendment H-1332 filed, adopted. H.J. 994. |
2017-04-12 | House | Amendment H-1331 filed, withdrawn. H.J. 994. |
2017-04-12 | House | Amendment H-1329 filed, adopted. H.J. 994. |
2017-04-12 | House | Substituted for HF 487. H.J. 993. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-03-21 | House | Read first time, passed on file. H.J. 707. |
2017-03-21 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 696. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 682. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Explanation of vote. S.J. 787. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 28, nays 21. S.J. 682. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3161B adopted. S.J. 680. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3161A adopted. S.J. 680. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3167 lost. S.J. 679. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3168 lost. S.J. 679. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3169 lost. S.J. 678. |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Amendment S-3166 lost. S.J. 677. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Amendments S-3161, S-3166, S-3167, S-3168, and S-3169 filed. S.J. 674. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 490. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 489. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1087 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HSB105 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 485.
HF487 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
HSB105 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 485.
HF487 (Similar To) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.