IA HSB105 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by HF487
Note: Legislation replaced by SF465
Note: Legislation replaced by SF465
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 485.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to medical malpractice claims, including noneconomic damage awards, contingency fees, expert witnesses, and defenses.
Title
A bill for an act relating to medical malpractice claims, including noneconomic damage awards, contingency fees, expert witnesses, and defenses.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-28 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 485. |
2017-02-20 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/21/2017 9:30AM House Lounge |
2017-02-13 | House | Subcommittee: Hinson, Gustafson and Olson. H.J. 270. |
2017-02-13 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1087 (Related) 2017-03-02 - Subcommittee recommends passage.
HF487 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
SF465 (Replaced by) 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
HF487 (Replaced by) 2017-04-12 - Withdrawn. H.J. 995.
SF465 (Replaced by) 2017-05-05 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB105 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB105.html |