IA SF459 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the carrying, transportation, or possession of firearms on real property comprising a person's place of employment. (Formerly SF 213.)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the carrying, transportation, or possession of firearms on real property comprising a person's place of employment. (Formerly SF 213.)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-23SenateSubcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
2020-01-21SenateSubcommittee Meeting: 01/23/2020 9:30AM RM 315.
2020-01-15SenateSubcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 86.
2019-04-04SenateReferred to Judiciary. S.J. 858.
2019-03-27SenateAmendment S-3086 filed. S.J. 779.
2019-03-04SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 457.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 450.

Same As/Similar To

SF213 (Similar To) 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 459. S.J. 457.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback