IA SF213 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 459. S.J. 457.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 459. S.J. 457.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the carrying, transportation, or possession of firearms on real property comprising a person's place of employment. (See SF 459.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the carrying, transportation, or possession of firearms on real property comprising a person's place of employment. (See SF 459.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 459. S.J. 457. |
2019-02-11 | Senate | Subcommittee: Schultz, Bisignano, and Chapman. S.J. 273. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 254. |
Same As/Similar To
SF459 (Similar To) 2020-01-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF213 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF213.html |