IA SF447 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the power of cities to regulate certain building restrictions, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1212.) Effective 5-2-19.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the power of cities to regulate certain building restrictions, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1212.) Effective 5-2-19.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-22 - House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 53 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 35 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-05-02SenateReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker, and sent to Governor.
2019-04-23SenateMessage from House. S.J. 1048.
2019-04-22HouseImmediate message. H.J. 945.
2019-04-22HousePassed House, yeas 53 nays 45. H.J. 943.
2019-04-22HouseAmendment H-1252 lost. H.J. 943.
2019-04-22HouseSubstituted for HF 718. H.J. 942.
2019-04-18HouseAmendment H-1252 filed. H.J. 926.
2019-03-14HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 562.
2019-03-12HouseRead first time, passed on file. H.J. 504.
2019-03-11HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 494.
2019-03-11SenateImmediate message. S.J. 538.
2019-03-13SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 620.
2019-03-11SenatePassed Senate, yeas 35, nays 11. S.J. 538.
2019-03-11SenateAmendment S-3014 filed, adopted. S.J. 537.
2019-03-04SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 459.
2019-03-04SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 447.

Same As/Similar To

SSB1212 (Related) 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB233 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
HF718 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback