IA SSB1212 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF447
Note: Legislation replaced by HF718
Note: Legislation replaced by HF718
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the power of cities to regulate certain building restrictions.
Title
A bill for an act relating to the power of cities to regulate certain building restrictions.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Subcommittee: Chapman, R. Smith, and Bisignano. |
2019-02-26 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON STATE GOVERNMENT |
Same As/Similar To
HSB233 (Related) 2019-03-07 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 470.
SF447 (Replaced by) 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
HF718 (Replaced by) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
SF447 (Replaced by) 2019-05-02 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1196.
HF718 (Replaced by) 2019-04-22 - Withdrawn. H.J. 945.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SSB1212 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SSB1212.html |