IA SF445 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to law enforcement including the establishment of a law enforcement officer privilege, criminal sentencing, and local enforcement of certain restrictions, and modifying certain criminal penalties. (Formerly SF 241.) Effective 7-1-17.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to law enforcement including the establishment of a law enforcement officer privilege, criminal sentencing, and local enforcement of certain restrictions, and modifying certain criminal penalties. (Formerly SF 241.) Effective 7-1-17.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-19 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-18 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-10HouseSigned by Governor. S.J. 1136.
2017-04-25HouseSent to Governor. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-25HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1134.
2017-04-20HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 1100.
2017-04-19SenateImmediate message. S.J. 1093.
2017-04-19SenatePassed Senate, ayes 50, nays 0. S.J. 1091.
2017-04-19SenateSenate concurred with S-3347. S.J. 1090.
2017-04-19SenateMessage from House, with amendment S-3347. S.J. 1063.
2017-04-18HouseImmediate message. H.J. 1074.
2017-04-18HousePassed House, ayes 97, nays 0. H.J. 1069.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1375 withdrawn. H.J. 1069.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1384 adopted, as amended. H.J. 1069.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1403 to amendment H-1384 filed, adopted. H.J. 1068.
2017-04-18HouseAmendment H-1384 filed. H.J. 1068.
2017-04-17HouseAmendment H-1375 filed. H.J. 1037.
2017-04-06HousePlaced on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905.
2017-03-29HouseCommittee report, recommending passage. H.J. 809.
2017-03-22HouseSubcommittee: Hinson, Baltimore and Olson. H.J. 757.
2017-03-15HouseRead first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 655.
2017-03-15HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 654.
2017-03-15SenateImmediate message. S.J. 618.
2017-03-15SenatePassed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 617.
2017-03-15SenateAmendment S-3150 adopted. S.J. 617.
2017-03-14SenateAmendment S-3150 filed. S.J. 607.
2017-03-06SenateCommittee report, approving bill. S.J. 480.
2017-03-06SenateIntroduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 474.

Same As/Similar To

SF241 (Similar To) 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook

Iowa State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF445
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF445.html
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Reprinted/SF445.html
Texthttp://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/enrolled/SF445.html
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/sjweb/pdf/March%2015,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/hjweb/pdf/April%2018,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/pubs/sjweb/pdf/April%2019,%202017.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20170315_SJNL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/HJNL/20170418_HJNL.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/SJNL/20170419_SJNL.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback