IA SF241 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-01 - NOBA: Graybook
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to law enforcement officers including the establishment of a law enforcement officer privilege and the confidentiality of certain law enforcement officer personnel records. (See SF 445.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to law enforcement officers including the establishment of a law enforcement officer privilege and the confidentiality of certain law enforcement officer personnel records. (See SF 445.)
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Dawson [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-01 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-06-01 | Senate | NOBA: Graybook |
2018-05-05 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-04 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-05-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-05-02 | Senate | NOBA: Final |
2018-05-02 | Senate | NOBA: House Floor |
2018-05-02 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Floor |
2018-04-27 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-27 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2018-04-26 | Senate | NOBA: Senate Full Approps |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Subcommittee: Dawson, Kinney, and Zaun. S.J. 275. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Judiciary. S.J. 271. |
Same As/Similar To
SF445 (Similar To) 2017-05-10 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1136.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF241 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF241.html |