IA SF443 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-20 - Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1203.
Pending: House Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the eligibility of cities to receive funding assistance to address abandoned buildings.(Formerly SF 113.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the eligibility of cities to receive funding assistance to address abandoned buildings.(Formerly SF 113.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Senate Local Government Report (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-20 | House | Rereferred to Local Government. H.J. 1203. |
2021-04-08 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 920. |
2021-04-02 | House | Committee amendment H-1338 filed. H.J. 882. |
2021-04-02 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 882. |
2021-04-01 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. Vote Total: 2-0 |
2021-03-31 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/01/2021 8:45AM House Lounge. |
2021-03-30 | House | Subcommittee: Gobble, Oldson and Wheeler. H.J. 871. |
2021-03-22 | House | Read first time, referred to Local Government. H.J. 760. |
2021-03-17 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 741. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 621. |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 47, nays 0. S.J. 618. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 448. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 442. |
Same As/Similar To
SF113 (Similar To) 2021-02-23 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 443. S.J. 448.