IA SF440 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement.
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to authorized expenditures for preschool programs under the statewide preschool program for four-year-old children and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1136.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to authorized expenditures for preschool programs under the statewide preschool program for four-year-old children and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1136.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends indefinite postponement. |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Subcommittee: Rozenboom, Hart, and C. Johnson. S.J. 537. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Education. S.J. 471. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 481. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 473. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1136 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/27/2017 12:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF440 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF440.html |