IA SF420 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 699.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act including personal degradation as a form of dependent adult abuse by caretakers in facilities and programs regulated by the department of inspections and appeals, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1099.)
Title
A bill for an act including personal degradation as a form of dependent adult abuse by caretakers in facilities and programs regulated by the department of inspections and appeals, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1099.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-21 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 699. |
2017-03-21 | Senate | HF 544 substituted. S.J. 697. |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 544. S.J. 594. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 460. |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 454. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1099 (Related) 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HSB146 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 484.
HF544 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
HSB146 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 484.
HF544 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF420 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF420.html |