IA SSB1099 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF420
Note: Legislation replaced by HF544
Note: Legislation replaced by HF544
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-23 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act including personal degradation as a form of dependent adult abuse by caretakers in facilities and programs regulated by the department of inspections and appeals.
Title
A bill for an act including personal degradation as a form of dependent adult abuse by caretakers in facilities and programs regulated by the department of inspections and appeals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-23 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage. |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 1:30PM Rm 206 |
2017-02-13 | Senate | Subcommittee: Costello, C. Johnson, and Jochum. |
2017-02-13 | Senate | By COMMITTEE ON HUMAN RESOURCES |
Same As/Similar To
SF420 (Replaced by) 2017-03-21 - Withdrawn. S.J. 699.
HF544 (Replaced by) 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
HSB146 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 484.
HF544 (Replaced by) 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
HSB146 (Related) 2017-02-28 - Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 484.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SSB1099 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/SSB1099.html |