IA SF42 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 227. S.J. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 227. S.J. 261.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act allowing the display of one registration plate on the rear of certain older, reconstructed, and specially constructed motor vehicles. (See SF 227.)
Title
A bill for an act allowing the display of one registration plate on the rear of certain older, reconstructed, and specially constructed motor vehicles. (See SF 227.)
Sponsors
Sen. Brad Zaun [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 227. S.J. 261. |
2019-01-23 | Senate | Subcommittee: Brown, Lykam, and Whiting. S.J. 157. |
2019-01-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 87. |
Same As/Similar To
SF227 (Similar To) 2019-04-22 - Fiscal note, as amended by House amendment S-3184.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF42 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF42.html |