IA SF227 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Fiscal note, as amended by House amendment S-3184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-22 - Fiscal note, as amended by House amendment S-3184.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the display of registration plates on motor vehicles. (Formerly SF 42.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the display of registration plates on motor vehicles. (Formerly SF 42.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-17 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 34 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-22 | Senate | Fiscal note, as amended by House amendment S-3184. |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3184. S.J. 995. |
2019-04-17 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 899. |
2019-04-24 | House | Explanation of vote. H.J. 1012. |
2019-04-17 | House | Passed House, yeas 96 nays 1. H.J. 896. |
2019-04-17 | House | Committee amendment H-1150 adopted. H.J. 896. |
2019-04-11 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 843. |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee amendment H-1150 filed. H.J. 767. |
2019-04-08 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 766. |
2019-04-03 | House | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 04/03/2019 8:15AM House Lounge. |
2019-04-02 | House | Subcommittee: Lohse, Huseman and Kressig. H.J. 712. |
2019-04-02 | House | Read first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 710. |
2019-04-01 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 704. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 802. |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 34, nays 14. S.J. 801. |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 261. |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 256. |
Same As/Similar To
SF42 (Similar To) 2019-02-07 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 227. S.J. 261.