IA SF419 | 2023-2024 | 90th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 908.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-04-20 - Withdrawn. S.J. 908.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to contract pharmacies and covered entities that participate in the 340B drug program.(Formerly SSB 1098.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to contract pharmacies and covered entities that participate in the 340B drug program.(Formerly SSB 1098.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-27 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 18 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 908. |
2023-04-20 | Senate | HF 423 substituted. S.J. 907. |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. S.J. 722. |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Attached to HF 423. S.J. 539. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 427. |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 420. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1098 (Related) 2023-02-27 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 419.
HSB137 (Related) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 423.
HF423 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.
HSB137 (Related) 2023-02-22 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as HF 423.
HF423 (Similar To) 2023-04-28 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 952.