IA SF414 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 108.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-16 - Subcommittee: Carlin, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 108.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to the provision of Medicaid coverage to pregnant women lawfully residing in the United States. (Formerly SF 251.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to the provision of Medicaid coverage to pregnant women lawfully residing in the United States. (Formerly SF 251.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-16 | Senate | Subcommittee: Carlin, Edler, and Quirmbach. S.J. 108. |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Amendment S-3158 filed. S.J. 940. |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Human Resources. S.J. 858. |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Amendment S-3085 filed. S.J. 779. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 436. |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 426. |
Same As/Similar To
SF251 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 414. S.J. 436.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=88&ba=SF414 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/publications/LGI/88/attachments/SF414.html |