IA SF409 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-24 - Referred to State Government. S.J. 621.
Pending: Senate State Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to filing complaints with the Iowa public information board.(Formerly SSB 1116.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to filing complaints with the Iowa public information board.(Formerly SSB 1116.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-02 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - Senate - Senate State Government Report (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-24 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 621. |
2022-02-02 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 196. |
2022-01-27 | Senate | Subcommittee recommends passage. |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/26/2022 3:00PM Room 217 Conference Room. |
2022-01-18 | Senate | Subcommittee: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Guth. S.J. 109. |
2021-04-01 | Senate | Referred to State Government. S.J. 726. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 406. |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 402. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1116 (Related) 2022-01-12 - Subcommittee reassigned: Cournoyer, Boulton, and Guth.