IA SF400 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 742.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-23 - Withdrawn. S.J. 742.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act requiring certain health insurance policies, contracts, or plans to provide coverage of applied behavior analysis for treatment of autism spectrum disorder for certain individuals, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1043.)
Title
A bill for an act requiring certain health insurance policies, contracts, or plans to provide coverage of applied behavior analysis for treatment of autism spectrum disorder for certain individuals, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1043.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. S.J. 742. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | HF 215 substituted. S.J. 741. |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Attached to similar HF 215. S.J. 648. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 446. |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 445. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB41 (Related) 2017-02-01 - Committee report, recommending passage. H.J. 178.
SSB1043 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF215 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
SSB1043 (Related) 2017-02-22 - Subcommittee recommends amendment and passage.
HF215 (Similar To) 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=SF400 |
Text | http://coolice.legis.iowa.gov/Legislation/87thGA/Bills/SenateFiles/Introduced/SF400.html |