IA HF215 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor. H.J. 825.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act requiring certain health insurance policies, contracts, or plans to provide coverage of applied behavior analysis for treatment of autism spectrum disorder for certain individuals, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 41.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 1, 2 and 3 effective 1-1-18.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act requiring certain health insurance policies, contracts, or plans to provide coverage of applied behavior analysis for treatment of autism spectrum disorder for certain individuals, and including applicability and effective date provisions. (Formerly HSB 41.) Effective 7-1-17, with exception of sections 1, 2 and 3 effective 1-1-18.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-23 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-15 - House - Passed House (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseSigned by Governor. H.J. 825.
2017-03-28HouseSent to Governor. H.J. 804.
2017-03-28HouseReported correctly enrolled, signed by Speaker and President. H.J. 804.
2017-03-23HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 761.
2017-03-23SenateImmediate message. S.J. 742.
2017-03-27SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 788.
2017-03-23SenateExplanation of vote. S.J. 761.
2017-03-23SenatePassed Senate, ayes 48, nays none. S.J. 741.
2017-03-23SenateSubstituted for SF 400. S.J. 741.
2017-03-16SenateRead first time and attached to similar SF 400. S.J. 648.
2017-03-16SenateMessage from House. S.J. 648.
2017-03-15HouseImmediate message. H.J. 654.
2017-03-15HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 755.
2017-03-15HouseExplanation of vote. H.J. 666.
2017-03-15HousePassed House, ayes 96, nays 0. H.J. 653.
2017-03-15HouseAmendment H-1017 lost. H.J. 652.
2017-03-15HouseAmendment H-1174 adopted. H.J. 652.
2017-03-09HouseAmendment H-1174 filed. H.J. 607.
2017-02-07HouseAmendment H-1017 filed. H.J. 246.
2017-02-06HouseIntroduced, placed on calendar. H.J. 193.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback