IA SF389 | 2021-2022 | 89th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee: Fry, Brown-Powers and Meyer, A.. H.J. 730.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Subcommittee: Fry, Brown-Powers and Meyer, A.. H.J. 730.
Pending: House Human Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program oversight.(Formerly SSB 1125.)
Title
A bill for an act relating to public assistance program oversight.(Formerly SSB 1125.)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall the bill pass? (Y: 30 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3038 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3037 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3036 be adopted? (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3038 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3037 be adopted? (Y: 18 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-23 - Senate - Shall amendment S–3036 be adopted? (Y: 19 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-17 - Senate - Senate Commerce Report (Y: 11 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | House | Subcommittee: Fry, Brown-Powers and Meyer, A.. H.J. 730. |
2021-03-05 | House | Referred to Human Resources. H.J. 611. |
2021-02-23 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 528. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 426. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Passed Senate, yeas 30, nays 18. S.J. 426. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3036 filed, lost. S.J. 425. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3037 filed, lost. S.J. 424. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Amendment S-3038 filed, lost. S.J. 423. |
2021-02-22 | Senate | Fiscal note. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 392. |
2021-02-17 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 386. |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1125 (Related) 2021-02-16 - Committee report approving bill, renumbered as SF 389.