IA SF388 | 2019-2020 | 88th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 27 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-28 - Subcommittee: Huseman, Judge and Thorup. H.J. 689.
Pending: House Transportation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

A bill for an act relating to the Iowa patriots memorial highway, and including applicability provisions.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A bill for an act relating to the Iowa patriots memorial highway, and including applicability provisions.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-28HouseSubcommittee: Huseman, Judge and Thorup. H.J. 689.
2019-03-28HouseRead first time, referred to Transportation. H.J. 674.
2019-03-28HouseMessage from Senate. H.J. 672.
2019-03-27SenateImmediate message. S.J. 772.
2019-03-27SenatePassed Senate, yeas 48, nays 0. S.J. 772.
2019-03-21SenateFiscal note.
2019-03-05SenateCommittee report, recommending passage. S.J. 472.
2019-02-27SenateSubcommittee: Zumbach, Koelker, and J. Smith. S.J. 419.
2019-02-26SenateIntroduced, referred to Transportation. S.J. 403.

Iowa State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback