IA SF374 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 21 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to providing legal assistance to indigent persons in criminal proceedings, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1023.) Various effective dates; see section 7 of bill.
Title
A bill for an act relating to providing legal assistance to indigent persons in criminal proceedings, and including effective date provisions. (Formerly SSB 1023.) Various effective dates; see section 7 of bill.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-11 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-04-06 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - House - Passed House (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
1969-12-31 - Senate - Passed Senate (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-21 | House | Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125. |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-18 | House | Reported correctly enrolled, signed by President and Speaker. S.J. 1061. |
2017-04-11 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 978. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 965. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 961. |
2017-04-11 | Senate | Senate concurred with S-3293. S.J. 960. |
2017-04-07 | Senate | Message from House, with amendment S-3293. S.J. 929. |
2017-04-06 | House | Immediate message. H.J. 918. |
2017-04-06 | House | Passed House, ayes 93, nays 1. H.J. 911. |
2017-04-06 | House | Committee amendment H-1214 adopted, as amended. H.J. 911. |
2017-04-06 | House | Amendment H-1304 to committee amendment H-1214 adopted. H.J. 911. |
2017-04-06 | House | Placed on calendar under unfinished business. H.J. 905. |
2017-04-05 | House | Amendment H-1304 filed. H.J. 898. |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee amendment H-1214 filed. H.J. 681. |
2017-03-16 | House | Committee report, recommending amendment and passage. H.J. 680. |
2017-03-08 | House | Subcommittee: Baltimore, Meyer and Paustian. H.J. 564. |
2017-03-07 | House | Read first time, referred to Judiciary. H.J. 542. |
2017-03-07 | House | Message from Senate. H.J. 520. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Immediate message. S.J. 500. |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, ayes 49, nays 0. S.J. 500. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Committee report, approving bill. S.J. 428. |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Introduced, placed on calendar. S.J. 422. |
Same As/Similar To
HSB18 (Related) 2017-02-14 - Passed subcommittee.
SSB1023 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SSB1023 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge