IA HSB18 | 2017-2018 | 87th General Assembly
Note: Legislation replaced by SF374
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: N/A - 0% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Passed subcommittee.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A bill for an act relating to providing legal assistance to indigent persons in criminal proceedings.
Title
A bill for an act relating to providing legal assistance to indigent persons in criminal proceedings.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Passed subcommittee. |
2017-01-19 | House | Subcommittee Meeting: 01/24/2017 2:00PM House Lounge |
2017-01-18 | House | Subcommittee: Carlin, Jones and Meyer. H.J. 95. |
2017-01-18 | House | By COMMITTEE ON JUDICIARY |
Same As/Similar To
SSB1023 (Related) 2017-02-21 - Subcommittee Meeting: 02/23/2017 2:30PM Senate Lobbyist Lounge
SF374 (Replaced by) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
SF374 (Replaced by) 2017-04-21 - Signed by Governor. S.J. 1125.
Iowa State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/legislation/BillBook?ga=87&ba=HSB18 |
Text | https://www.legis.iowa.gov/docs/Published/LGI/87/Attachments/HSB18.html |